Sanchez Campos, Millaray (CPSO#: 67884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smyth Medical Centre
Suite 200
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4G3
Phone: (613) 249-0666
Fax: (613) 249-0804
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Millaray Sanchez Campos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sanchez Campos ( CPSO# 67884 )

Business Address:
200 - 1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 249-0666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILLARAY SANCHEZ CAMPOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCHEZ CAMPOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996