Sandejas, Mario Fernandez (CPSO#: 61097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 474-0614
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Sandejas Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sandejas ( CPSO# 61097 )

Business Address:
Unit 2B
1695 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 4W3
Phone Number: (519) 474-0614

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIO FERNANDEZ SANDEJAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDEJAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 03 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2001
Summary:

 On April 16, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sandejas guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

The 
 Committee directed the following penalty:

(1) recorded reprimand;
(2) 18-months suspension, to 
 commence no later than June 1, 2001, six-months of the suspension        to be suspended provided 
 Dr. Sandejas continues to receive care from a psychiatrist               acceptable to the 
 Registrar; and, 

The Committee imposed the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. 
 Sandejas( certificate of registration:

(A) that Dr. Sandejas( practice be restricted to patients 
 over the age of 16 years.  The term to be removed upon Dr. Sandejas undergoing a forensic 
 psychiatric assessment by a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar and upon that psychiatrist 
 providing a report to the Registrar indicating that Dr. Sandejas is within the lowest risk 
 category for recurrence of sexual misconduct.

On May 8, 2001 the College appealed the decision of 
 the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. On May 16, 2001, Dr. Sandejas cross appealed the 
 decision to the Divisional Court.

On June 17, 2002, the College abandoned the appeal to the 
 Divisional Court. On June 28, 2002, Dr. Sandejas abandoned his cross-appeal..

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 28 Jun 2002
Hearing Date(s): Oct 13, 2000