Sanders, David William (CPSO#: 66534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite E1-326
800 Commissioners Rd. East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8086
Fax: (519) 685-8016
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David W. Sanders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sanders ( CPSO# 66534 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite E1-326
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998