Sandhu, Amarpreet Singh (CPSO#: 82061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westbram Family Physicians
Unit 104
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 451-1244
Fax: (905) 451-6955
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amarpreet Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sandhu ( CPSO# 82061 )

Business Address:
West Bram Family Physicians
104 - 100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone Number: (905) 451-1244

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMARPREET SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007