Sandhu, Guninder Bir Singh (CPSO#: 99127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Government Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-8404
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton ON  L7A 4S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99127 )
Dr. J. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99128 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone Number: (416) 244-8404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Jan 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Guninder Bir Singh Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.