Sandhu, Nimani (CPSO#: 79462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2125 Wyecroft Rd.
Unit 6
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone: (905) 842-7051
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nimani Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sandhu ( CPSO# 79462 )

Business Address:
Unit 6
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 842-7051

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMANI SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005