Sandler, Samantha Dawn (CPSO#: 66595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Tishler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tishler ( CPSO# 62483 )
Dr. S. Sandler ( CPSO# 66595 )

Business Address:
104 - 200 Ronson Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9

Business Address:
LMC Bayview
Suite 107
1929 Bayview
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8

Business Address:
600 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 306-8404

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100


Corporation Name: Samantha Sandler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sandler ( CPSO# 66595 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA DAWN SANDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 1998 to 24 Jul 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997