Sandre, Roger Martin (CPSO#: 60647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7074
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandre ( CPSO# 60647 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER MARTIN SANDRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1990