Sangster-Gibson, Susan Isabel (CPSO#: 54580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: Sangster, Susan Isabel (used until: 27 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Clinic
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Fax: (613) 546-2799
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Sangster-Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sangster-Gibson ( CPSO# 54580 )

Business Address:
D2 - 1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 546-9721

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ISABEL SANGSTER-GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGSTER-GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1985