Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Santher, Kathiraveloo (CPSO#: 29476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 358-0171 Ext. 53809
Fax: (905) 358-4954
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara on the Lake Family Health
Team
Box 777
1882 Niagara Stone Road
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Niagara Medical Group
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Santher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Santher ( CPSO# 29476 )

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Avenue
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Business Address:
Niagara Child and Youth Services
243 Church Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 3E8
Phone Number: (905) 688-6850

Business Address:
Niagara Child and Youth Services
1604 Merrittville Highway
Welland ON  L3B 5N5
Phone Number: (905) 384-9551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHIRAVELOO SANTHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1977