Santhiramohan, Ratha (CPSO#: 87330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 7721
Fax: (905) 883-2246
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ratha Santhiramohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Santhiramohan ( CPSO# 87330 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RATHA SANTHIRAMOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTHIRAMOHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2010 to 13 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2011 to 13 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012