Santos, Katherine (CPSO#: 103951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone: 613-533-9303
Fax: 613-544-9899
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: 613-544-4900
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: 613-544-4900
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE SANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016