Saplys, Ramunas Felix Juozas (CPSO#: 51664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 275-0020
Fax: (905) 275-1094
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. J. F. Saplys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saplys ( CPSO# 51664 )

Business Address:
406 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 275-0020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMUNAS FELIX JUOZAS SAPLYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPLYS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1983