Sarid, Esther (CPSO#: 43209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York Medical Arts Building
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 141
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 491-4335
Fax: (416) 491-1719
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esther Sarid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sarid ( CPSO# 43209 )

Business Address:
North York Medical Arts Building
141 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 491-4335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER SARID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1985