Sathi, Nandini (CPSO#: 65037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 969-3260
Fax: (416) 971-7718
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 King Street West C120
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-9990
Fax: (416) 368-9992
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sathi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sathi ( CPSO# 65037 )

Business Address:
9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 969-3260

Business Address:
C120
11 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 368-9990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANDINI SATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993