Satz, Stephanie L (CPSO#: 102662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Feb 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Phone: (519) 944-1118
Fax: 519944-5415
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Mem Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 322-2501
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Feb 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Stephanie L. Satz may practise medicine independently in family medicine.