Saunders, Fraser Worden (CPSO#: 30238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3696
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Saunders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Saunders ( CPSO# 30238 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 544-1284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRASER WORDEN SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1978