Sauro, Victor Sandro (CPSO#: 68162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Sauro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sauro ( CPSO# 68162 )

Business Address:
Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 503-2591

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR SANDRO SAURO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAURO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2000