Sawka, Barry Wayne (CPSO#: 55243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Laboratories
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2891
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry W. Sawka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sawka ( CPSO# 55243 )

Business Address:
438 6th Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6K2
Phone Number: (519) 376-3891

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY WAYNE SAWKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1994