Scampoli, Nicola (CPSO#: 71424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530 Ext. .
Fax: (905) 813-4444
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1065 Canadian Place Unit 123
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 626-2100 Ext. 507
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scampoli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Scampoli ( CPSO# 71424 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Business Address:
Suites 122-123
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (416) 626-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLA SCAMPOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCAMPOLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999