Scarrow, John Robert (CPSO#: 42611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
386 Prince Edward Drive North
Toronto ON  M8X 2L7
Phone: (416) 236-2828
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Scarrow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Scarrow ( CPSO# 42611 )

Business Address:
386 Prince Edward Drive North
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2L7
Phone Number: (416) 236-2828

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT SCARROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCARROW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1984