Scerbo, Filippe Ross (CPSO#: 98752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Health Experts
30 Prospect Street, Suite 200
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 2357284
Fax: 9052357320
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filippe Scerbo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Scerbo ( CPSO# 98752 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILIPPE ROSS SCERBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCERBO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 2016 to 11 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016