Schaik, Allison (CPSO#: 78099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Shaikh, Azhar Allison (used until: 13 Jan 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison Schaik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schaik ( CPSO# 78099 )

Business Address:
Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (226) 268-0489

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Chapleau Health Services,Chapleau General Hospital Chapleau
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Smooth Rock Falls Hospital Smooth Rock Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON SCHAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008