Schellenberg, Roberta Sandra (CPSO#: 75923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
780 Midpark Drive
Kingston ON  K7M 7P6
Phone: (613) 507-4457
Fax: (613) 507-4458
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roberta Schellenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Schellenberg ( CPSO# 75923 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
780 Midpark Drive
Kingston ON  K7M 7P6
Phone Number: (613) 507-4457

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTA SANDRA SCHELLENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHELLENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2001 to 09 Apr 2001
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2009