Schemitsch, Emil Harald (CPSO#: 54083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C9-116
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3349
Fax: (519) 646-6347
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Schemitsch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Schemitsch ( CPSO# 54083 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room C9-116
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3349

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMIL HARALD SCHEMITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEMITSCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986