Schieck, David Orrin (CPSO#: 67742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Schieck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schieck ( CPSO# 67742 )
Dr. E. Choi ( CPSO# 67848 )

Business Address:
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ORRIN SCHIECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIECK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996