Schincariol, Holly Paige (CPSO#: 71066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: Foreman, Holly Paige (used until: 23 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Essex CommunityHealthCentre
1361 Ouellette Avenue #101
Windsor ON  N8X 1J6
Phone: (519) 253-8481
Fax: (519) 253-0891
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Schincariol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2009


Corporation Name: H. Schincariol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schincariol ( CPSO# 71066 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
1361 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1J6
Phone Number: (519) 253-8481

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOLLY PAIGE SCHINCARIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHINCARIOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999