Schindler, Nathalie Laura (CPSO#: 92647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University and
McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Peds, Division of Emerg Med
1280 Main St West, HSC - 2.N49l
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schindler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Schindler ( CPSO# 92647 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE LAURA SCHINDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHINDLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2010 to 07 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2014