Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Schlachta, Christopher Mark (CPSO#: 62295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CSTAR / University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
7th Floor
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3478
Fax: (519) 663-3481
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Schlachta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Schlachta ( CPSO# 62295 )

Business Address:
CSTAR/University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
7th Floor
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3478

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARK SCHLACHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHLACHTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991