Schreader, Alicia Gaye (CPSO#: 60866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 604
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 540-9400
Fax: (289) 396-7595
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alicia Schreader Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schreader ( CPSO# 60866 )

Business Address:
1 Yonge Street
Suite 604
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 540-9400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICIA GAYE SCHREADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHREADER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990