Schreiber, Martin (CPSO#: 58106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Health Centre
61 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Suite 133
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7454
Fax: (416) 867-3720
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Goguen & Schreiber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schreiber ( CPSO# 58106 )
Dr. J. Goguen ( CPSO# 58337 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital Health
Centre
6th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3714

Business Address:
St. Michael's Health Centre
61 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Suite 9-133
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN SCHREIBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHREIBER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989