Schriver, Christine Margaret (CPSO#: 63394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 155
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-4273
Fax: (613) 623-8269
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Schriver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Schriver ( CPSO# 63394 )

Business Address:
Suite 155
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-4273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARGARET SCHRIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRIVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1994