Schulz, Valerie Marie Nocent (CPSO#: 51594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital PO Box 5339
Room B3 408
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
PO Box 5375
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St Joseph's Health Centre
P O Box 5777
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4L6
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St. Joseph's Hospice of London
485 Windermere Rd,
London ON  N5X 2T1
Canada
Phone: 519-438-2102
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Parkwood Site
St Joseph's Health Care
801 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 5J1
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valerie N. Schulz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Schulz ( CPSO# 51594 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
PO Box 5777
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
801 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Room B3-408
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE MARIE NOCENT SCHULZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 03 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1984