Schuringa, Peter Colin Randolph (CPSO#: 63702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Park Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 1Y3
Phone: (519) 576-0620
Fax: (519) 576-5729
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Schuringa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schuringa ( CPSO# 63702 )

Business Address:
105 Park Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 1Y3
Phone Number: (519) 576-0620

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER COLIN RANDOLPH SCHURINGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHURINGA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992