Schutz, Hartmut (CPSO#: 19375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Sherway Drive
3rd Floor
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 259-7580 Ext. 5824
Fax: (416) 521-4140
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Schutz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARTMUT SCHUTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1965