Schwarz, Bogdan Leszek (CPSO#: 68571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: Schwarz-Michorowski, Bogdan Leszek (used until: 17 Nov 2004 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
89 Dawson Rd.
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 829-3861
Fax: (519) 829-2301
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Schwarz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Schwarz ( CPSO# 68571 )

Business Address:
111 - 89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 829-3861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOGDAN LESZEK SCHWARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1994