Schwarz, Peter Robert (CPSO#: 66826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 225
275 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2J4
Phone: (705) 256-8585
Fax: (705) 256-8588
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Schwarz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schwarz ( CPSO# 66826 )

Business Address:
Unit 225
275 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2J4
Phone Number: (705) 256-8585

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 21, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 12, 2016, North Shore Health Network notified the College that Dr. Peter Schwarz's privileges were suspended, effective September 21, 2016.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 19, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 13, 2016, Sault Area Hospital notified the College that Dr. Peter Schwarz's privileges were suspended, effective September 19, 2016.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 19, 2008
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF HOSPITAL PRIVILEGES:

On September 25, 2008, Sault Area Hospital notified the College that Dr. Peter Robert Schwarz's privileges were suspended effective September 19, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 29 Nov 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Dr. Peter Robert Schwarz (March 22, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Schwarz’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Schwarz engaged in the sexual abuse of Patient A and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by, among other things, making inappropriate and/or sexual comments to Patient A and engaging in inappropriate, sexual and/or physical contact with Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): June 11-15, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2) As from 12:01 a.m., November 29, 2017, by order of the Inquiries,
            Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the
            certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Robert Schwarz::

            i.    Dr. Schwarz's practice shall be restricted in accordance with the
                  clinical supervision requirements set out below at (ii) - (xv) of the
                  Order.  For greater clarity:

                  a.    Dr. Schwarz shall not issue new prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                        Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines or Other
                        Targeted Substances and/or any other Monitored Drugs, unless the
                        requirements set out at (ii) - (xii) of the Order are met; and
                  
                  b.    Dr. Schwarz shall not issue any continuing prescription or
                        authorize any refill or renewal of such prescriptions unless the
                        requirements set out at (ii) - (xii) of the Order are met; or
                  
                  c.    If Dr. Schwarz is unable to engage or retain a Clinical Supervisor
                        as set out below, Dr. Schwarz shall comply with the requirements
                        set out at (xiii) - (xv) of the Order.  
                  
            ii.   Dr. Schwarz shall engage a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                  at his own expense who shall:

                  a.    review with Dr. Schwarz every patient to whom Dr. Schwarz intends
                        to continue to prescribe any Narcotic Drug, Narcotic Preparation,
                        Controlled Drug, Benzodiazepine or Other Targeted Substance and/or
                        Any other Monitored Drug prior to Dr. Schwarz issuing any
                        continuing prescription or authorizing any refill or renewal of
                        such prescription to ensure that the prescription and Dr. Schwarz's
                        assessment, clinical examination, risk assessment for addiction and
                        on-going management and follow-up of the patient is appropriate.
                  
                  b.    directly observe at least three (3) patient encounters per week in
                        which Dr. Schwarz issues a prescription for a Narcotic Drug,
                        Narcotic Preparation, Controlled Drug, Benzodiazepine or Other
                        Targeted Substance and/or any other Monitored Drug.
                  
            iii.  Dr. Schwarz shall not initiate any new prescription for any Narcotic
                  Drug, Narcotic Preparation, Controlled Drug, Benzodiazepine or Other
                  Targeted Substance and/or any other Monitored Drug to any patient who is
                  not currently prescribed the medication in question by Dr. Schwarz,
                  unless recommended by the Clinical Supervisor prior to initiation of the
                  prescription.  

            iv.   Dr. Schwarz shall keep a log of all prescriptions for, and all refills or
                  renewals of prescriptions for, Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                  Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and all
                  other Monitored Drugs, as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at
                  least the following information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (a)   the date of the appointment;
                  (b)   the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  (c)   the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (d)   the clinical indication;
                  (e)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  (f)   Dr. Schwarz's signature;
                  (g)   the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review; and
                  (h)   the Clinical Supervisor's signature.
                  
            v.    Dr. Schwarz shall keep a copy of all prescriptions he writes and a copy
                  of all refills or renewals of prescriptions he authorizes for Narcotic
                  Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and all other Monitored Drugs, in the corresponding
                  patient chart.

            vi.   Dr. Schwarz shall ensure that the undertaking of a Clinical Supervisor as
                  set out in Schedule "E" to the Order is delivered to the College by
                  December 13, 2017.  

            vii.  Dr. Schwarz shall fully cooperate with and abide by any recommendations
                  of his Clinical Supervisor, including with respect to patient care,
                  practice improvements, and continuing education.  For greater certainty
                  though without limiting the foregoing, if during or after an observation
                  of a patient encounter or a chart review the Clinical Supervisor is of
                  the view that any conduct or care on Dr. Schwarz's part will put a
                  patient or patients at risk, Dr. Schwarz shall immediately comply with
                  any recommendations made by the Clinical Supervisor to protect the
                  patient(s) from risk.

            viii. The Clinical Supervisor shall provide reports to the College at least
                  once every two (2) weeks for the first four (4) weeks, and at least once
                  per month thereafter. Reports shall be in reasonable detail, containing
                  all information to assist the College in evaluating Dr. Schwarz's
                  standard of practice, as well as his participation in and compliance with
                  the terms of the Order.

            ix.   Dr. Schwarz shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor
                  and by staff at any location where Dr. Schwarz practices to the College
                  of all information necessary to fulfil the Clinical Supervisor's
                  undertaking and to monitor and facilitate Dr. Schwarz's compliance with
                  the Order.

            x.    Dr. Schwarz shall cooperate with any inspection of his practice
                  location(s) by the College, which may be made without notice and which
                  may include but not be limited to reviews of patient charts and/or other
                  records and to interviews of staff at any location where Dr. Schwarz
                  practices, in order to monitor his compliance with the Order.  Dr.
                  Schwarz shall consent to the disclosure by the College to any Chief of
                  Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any practice
                  location, of all information deemed by the College to be necessary to
                  monitor or facilitate Dr. Schwarz's compliance with the Order.

            xi.   Dr. Schwarz shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Order,
                  provide the College with the addresses of all locations where he
                  practices, and, if he commences practice at a new location subsequently,
                  shall provide the College with its address within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            xii.  Dr. Schwarz shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Order,
                  provide to the College his irrevocable consent in the form as set out in
                  Schedule "F" for the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario
                  Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), and the Drug Program Services Branch -
                  Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics
                  Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, to monitor his compliance with the terms
                  of the Order.

            xiii. If Dr. Schwarz has not delivered an undertaking signed by a Clinical
                  Supervisor to the College by December 13, 2017, the following terms will
                  take effect:

                  a.    Effective January 13, 2018 ("the Restriction Date")
                  
                        1.    Dr. Schwarz shall be restricted from prescribing or from
                              authorizing any refills or renewals of prescriptions for any
                              Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines or Other Targeted Substances and/or any other
                              Monitored Drugs, and the fact of this restriction shall be a
                              term, condition or limitation on his certificate of
                              registration. For greater clarity, the restriction on issuing
                              new prescriptions without the prior recommendation of a
                              Clinical Supervisor, set out at (iii) above, takes effect as
                              of the date of the Order;
                  
                        2.    Dr. Schwarz shall return any supplies of Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines or
                              Other Targeted Substances and/or any other Monitored Drugs
                              that are presently in his possession, in any place, to a
                              pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in the
                              College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."
                  
                  b.    Effective December 13, 2017 ("the Notice Date"):
                  
                        1.    Dr. Schwarz shall immediately notify his patients that as of
                              the Restriction Date, he is restricted from prescribing any
                              Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines or Other Targeted Substances and/or any other
                              Monitored Drugs;
                  
                        2.    Dr. Schwarz shall immediately begin the process of referring
                              all patients to whom he prescribes any Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                              Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored Drugs, to
                              other physicians for assessment and care;
                  
                        3.    Between the Notice Date and the Restriction Date, Dr. Schwarz
                              may only issue continuing prescriptions for or authorize the
                              refill or renewal of prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines or
                              Other Targeted Substances and/or any other Monitored Drugs to
                              the extent necessary to ensure continuity of care during the
                              referral process;
                  
                        4.    Dr. Schwarz shall keep a log of all patients referred to
                              other physicians pursuant to the terms of (xiii)(b)(2) above
                              (the "Referral Log"). Dr. Schwarz shall include in the
                              Referral Log the name of each patient referred, the name of
                              the physician referred to, and the date of referral. 
                  
                        5.    Dr. Schwarz shall not accept any new patients who currently
                              require prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                              Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                              Targeted Substances and all other Monitored Drugs.
                  
            xiv.  If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking as set out in
                  Schedule "E" to the Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill
                  its provisions, Dr. Schwarz shall, within fourteen (14) days of receiving
                  notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                  similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure
                  that it is delivered to the College within that time.

            xv.   If Dr. Schwarz is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the terms set
                  out in (xiv) above, Dr. Schwarz shall immediately comply with the terms
                  set out at (xiii)(b)(1)-(5) above and, within one (1) month, shall comply
                  with the terms set out at (xiii)(a)(1)-(2) above.

            (2 of 2) As from 12:01 a.m., April 13, 2017, by order of the Inquiries,
            Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the
            certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Robert Schwarz:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (i)   Dr. Schwarz shall not engage in any professional encounters with female
                  patients of any age unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                  presence of a monitor who is a female member of a regulated health
                  profession who is acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor");

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Schwarz shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  a     Remain in the examination room or consultation room at all times
                        during all professional encounters with all female patients, even
                        if another person is accompanying the patient;
                  b.    Carefully observe all of his physical examinations (including but
                        not limited to internal examinations) of all female patients, with
                        an unobstructed view of the examination;
                  c.    refrain from performing any other functions, except those required
                        in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A",
                        while observing him in all professional encounters with female
                        patients;
                  d.    Keep a patient log in the form attached as Appendix "B" to this
                        Order of all the female patients that Dr. Schwarz has an in-person
                        professional encounter with in the Practice Monitor's presence (the
                        "Log");
                  e.    Initial the corresponding entry in the records of each patient
                        noted in the Log to confirm that the Practice Monitor was in the
                        presence of Dr. Schwarz at all times during each female in-person
                        professional encounter;
                  f.    Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and
                  g.    Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        Undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Schwarz shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request;

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iv)  Dr. Schwarz shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"),
                  within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he shall inform the
                  College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location;

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (v)   Dr. Schwarz shall post a sign in his waiting room(s) and each of his
                  examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in
                  a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as
                  Appendix "C";
            (vi)  Dr. Schwarz shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in his
                  waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or consulting rooms, in
                  all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location;
            (vii) Dr. Schwarz shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vi)
                  above within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            Notifying Patients

            (viii)Dr. Schwarz shall ensure that each patient scheduled for an appointment
                  with him is directly notified, prior to the appointment, of the details
                  of the restriction described in section (i).

            Monitoring

            (ix)  Dr. Schwarz shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Schwarz's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;
            (x)   Dr. Schwarz shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Schwarz's compliance with the terms of
                  this Order;
            (xi)  Dr. Schwarz shall consent to the College providing any and all
                  information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling her
                  Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Schwarz's compliance with the
                  terms of this Order;
            (xii) Dr. Schwarz shall consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Schwarz's compliance with
                  this Order; and
            (xiii)Dr. Schwarz shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from
                  the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 29, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015,Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Peter Robert Schwarz:
(1) on or about December 4, 2015, at the City of Sault Ste Marie did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.
(2) on or about October 15, 2015, at the City of Sault Ste Marie did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: September 16, 2016
Place of charges: Sault Ste Marie, Ontario
Sault Ste Marie Police Service