Schweitzer, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 69238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Centennial Parkway South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2C5
Phone: (905) 662-1234
Fax: (905) 662-9422
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schweitzer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schweitzer ( CPSO# 69238 )

Business Address:
60 Centennial Parkway South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2C5
Phone Number: (905) 662-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH SCHWEITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWEITZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997