Schwindt, Jason Mark (CPSO#: 102110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elmira Medical Centre
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone: (519) 669-5493
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Craig, Norris, Jones, Onuska and Schwindt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Onuska ( CPSO# 59693 )
Dr. I. Norris ( CPSO# 52498 )
Dr. G. Jones ( CPSO# 55549 )
Dr. J. Craig ( CPSO# 32717 )
Dr. J. Schwindt ( CPSO# 102110)

Business Address:
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone Number: (519) 669-5493


Corporation Name: Mark Schwindt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schwindt ( CPSO# 102110)

Business Address:
Elmira Medical Centre
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone Number: (519) 669-5493

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Waterloo ON  N2G 4K9
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON MARK SCHWINDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWINDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015