Scott, Douglas Frederick (CPSO#: 82762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nipigon Medical Clinic
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON  P0T 2J0
Phone: (807) 887-5252
Fax: (807) 887-1645
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas F. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Scott ( CPSO# 82762 )

Business Address:
Nipigon Medical Clinic
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON  P0T 2J0
Phone Number: (807) 887-5252

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS FREDERICK SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007