Scott, Jaime Marie (CPSO#: 58723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 5038
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutton and Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hutton ( CPSO# 58076 )
Dr. J. Scott ( CPSO# 58723 )

Business Address:
250 Reid Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 3R1
Phone Number: (705) 743-1851

Business Address:
Peterbrough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIME MARIE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989