Sedran, David (CPSO#: 66500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-1150
Fax: (416) 256-0742
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Sedran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sedran ( CPSO# 66500 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-1150

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SEDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995