Seegobin, Ramesh (CPSO#: 81933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B2
3300 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4K 5Z2
Phone: (905) 303-2229
Fax: (905) 303-0437
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

99 sinclair ave suite 106
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 877-9998
Fax: (905) 877-8994
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramesh Seegobin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Seegobin ( CPSO# 81933 )

Business Address:
B2 - 3300 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 5Z2
Phone Number: (905) 303-2229

Business Address:
106 - 99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone Number: (905) 877-9998

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMESH SEEGOBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEGOBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2004 to 26 Dec 2004
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007