Segal-Nadler, Roanne J (CPSO#: 58425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Box 911
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Segal-Nadler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Segal-Nadler ( CPSO# 58425 )
Dr. S. Nadler ( CPSO# 56601 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
780 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V8
Phone Number: (613) 228-7755

Business Address:
691 Brookdale Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6J 5C6
Phone Number: (613) 937-4555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROANNE J SEGAL-NADLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL-NADLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Oct 1993
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1988