Seguin, Joseph Wilfrid Dennis (CPSO#: 28143)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Seguin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 202 2000 Credit Valley Road Mississauga, ON L5M 4N4 Tel: 905 820 5102
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Weal Guirguis for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 11 Sep 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 2015