Sehdev, Dashminder Singh (CPSO#: 84538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46368
Fax: (905) 527-7051
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Latitude Aeromedical Works
Hangar 4
Hamilton International Airport
Mount Hope ON  L0R 1W0
Canada
Phone: (289) 426-1133
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. DS Sehdev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sehdev ( CPSO# 84538 )
Dr. M. Venantius ( CPSO# 84304 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton International Airport
Hangar 4
9300 Airport Road
Mount Hope ON  L0R 1W0
Phone Number: (289) 426-1133

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322


Corporation Name: Dr. M Venantius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sehdev ( CPSO# 84538 )
Dr. M. Venantius ( CPSO# 84304 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
123 James Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Phone Number: (905) 667-4848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DASHMINDER SINGH SEHDEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHDEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2009