Sehmbi, Herman (CPSO#: 102449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:B. J. Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine Room C3 127
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sehmbi & Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Shah ( CPSO# 102469)
Dr. H. Sehmbi ( CPSO# 102449)

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Department of Anesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 850-5598

Business Address:
26 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 04 Feb 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Herman Sehmbi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Sehmbi holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sehmbi  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sehmbi's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sehmbi's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017, and expires on June 30, 2020.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Sehmbi's academic appointment at the University of
                  Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.