Seidler, Christine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 74912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South River Medical Centre
140 Ottawa Avenue West
P O Box 579
South River ON  P0A 1X0
Phone: (705) 386-0512
Fax: (705) 386-0716
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. E. Seidler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Seidler ( CPSO# 74912 )

Business Address:
South River Medical Centre
140 Ottawa Avenue
PO Box 579
South River ON  P0A 1X0
Phone Number: (705) 752-2143

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ELIZABETH SEIDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIDLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 24 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2003