Selby, Peter Leslie (CPSO#: 65523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36859
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rita & Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Selby ( CPSO# 65523 )
Dr. R. Selby ( CPSO# 66705 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
A 459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5105

Business Address:
CAMH
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LESLIE SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993