Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sellers, Laurene Rebecca (CPSO#: 59683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Weber Medical Centre
1400 Weber Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 3Z8
Canada
Phone: (519) 748-6933
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

723 King St. W.
Kitchener ON  N3G 1E3
Canada
Phone: (519) 745-2366
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Peninsula Family Health Team
24 Moore Street
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0
Canada
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

Peninsula Family Heath Team
7275 Highway 6
Tobermory ON  N0H 2R0
Canada
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

St Marys General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURENE REBECCA SELLERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1989